MULTIPLICATION HELP - MULTIPLICATION OF LARGE NUMBERS MADE EASY

Your Ad Here





Get
Multiplication Help
through Fun Games

For details, see near
the bottom of this page.

Please study
Two Digit Multiplication,
if you have not already done so.

That knowledge is a prerequiste here.

Here, We deal with Multiplication
by Three or More Digit Numbers.

Multiplication by Three
or More Digit Number

multiplication by two digit number,
we have already seen the following.

We do the multiplication by single
digit number in ones' place.

Then we do the multiplication by
single digit number in tens' place.

We write the second product below
the first product starting from tens'
place and proceeding to the left.

Here also we do the same.

Then, we do the multiplication by
single digit number in hundreds' place.

We write the third product below the
second product starting from hundreds'
place and proceeding to the left.

The process will be clear
from the following examples.





Research-based personalized
Math Help tutoring program :
Multiplication help

Here is a resource for Solid Foundation in
Math Fundamentals from Middle thru High School.
You can check your self by the

FREE TRIAL.

Are you spending lot of money for math tutors to your
child and still not satisfied with his/her grades ?

Do you feel that more time from the tutor and
more personalized Math Help to identify and fix
the problems faced by your child will help ?

Here is a fool proof solution I strongly recommend
and that too With a minuscule fraction of the amount
you spent on tutors with unconditional 100% money
back Guarantee, if you are not satisfied.

SUBSCRIBE, TEST, IF NOT SATISFIED, RETURN FOR FULL REFUND

It is like having an unlimited time from an excellent Tutor.

It is an Internet-based math tutoring software program
that identifies exactly where your child needs help and
then creates a personal instruction plan tailored to your
child’s specific needs.

If your child can use a computer and access
the Internet, he or she can use the program.
And your child can access the program anytime
from any computer with Internet access.

Unique program to help improve math skills quickly and painlessly.

There is an exclusive, Parent Information Page provides YOU
with detailed reports of your child’s progress so you can
monitor your child’s success and give them encouragement.
These Reports include

  • Time spent using the program
  • Assessment results
  • Personalized remediation curriculum designed for your child
  • Details the areas of weakness where your child needs additional help
  • Provides the REASONS WHY your child missed a concept
  • List of modules accessed and amount of time spent in each module
  • Quiz results
  • Creates reports that can be printed and used to discuss issues with your child’s teachers
These reports are created and stored in a secure section
of the program, available exclusively to you, the parent.
The section is accessed by a password that YOU create and use.
No unauthorized users can access this information.

Personalized remediation curriculum designed for your child

Thus The features of this excellent Tutoring program are

  • Using detailed testing techniques
  • Identifing exactly where a student needs help.
  • Its unique, smart system pinpointing precise problem areas -
  • slowly and methodically guiding the student
  • raising to the necessary levels to fix the problem.

Not a “one-size-fits-all” approach!

Its research-based results have proven that
it really works for all students! in improving
math skills and a TWO LETTER GRADE INCREASE in
math test scores!,if they invest time in using
the program.

Proven for More than 10,000 U.S. public school
students who increased their math scores.

Proven methodology!



Example 1 of
Multiplication Help

Find 456 x 789

Solution :

        456
        789
     -------              5  5
       4104              4  4
      3648              4  3
     3192
     -------
     359784
     -------

The process is same as we learnt in

Two Digit Multiplication.

First product, 456 x 9 = 4104.

Second product, 456 x 8 = 3648.

The second product 3648 is written
below the first product starting from
tens' place and proceeding to the left.

The new thing is the third product.

Here, the third product,
456 x 7 (= 3192) is written below the
second product starting from hundreds'
place and proceeding to the left.

All the three products, after placing
properly, are added to get 359784.

Thus 456 x 789 = 359784. Ans.

Great deals on School & Homeschool Curriculum Books and Software

Get The Best Grades With the Least Amount of Effort :
Multiplication Help

Here is a collection of proven tips,
tools and techniques to turn you into
a super-achiever - even if you've never
thought of yourself as a "gifted" student.

The secrets will help you absorb, digest
and remember large chunks of information
quickly and easily so you get the best grades
with the least amount of effort.

If you apply what you read from the above
collection, you can achieve best grades without
giving up your fun, such as TV, surfing the net,
playing video games or going out with friends!

Know more about the Speed Study System.

Example 2 of
Multiplication Help

Find 1432 x 2513

Solution :

         1432
         2513
     ---------              1  
        4296             
       1432              1  1 2
      7160
     2864
     ---------
     3598616
     ---------

The process is same as we learnt in

Two Digit Multiplication.

First product, 1432 x 3 = 4296.

Second product, 1432 x 1 = 1432.

The second product 1432 is written
below the first product starting from
tens' place and proceeding to the left.

Third product, 1432 x 5 = 7160.

The third product 7160 is written below
the secod product starting from hundreds'
place and proceeding to the left.

The new thing is the fourth product.
Here the fourth product,
1432 x 2 (= 2864) is written below the
third product starting from thousands'
place and proceeding to the left.

All the four products, after placing
properly, are added to get 3598616.

Thus 1432 x 2513 = 3598616. Ans.

This process can be extended
to multiplication of numbers
of any number of digits.

If there are five digits, the fifth
product,is placed below the fourth
product starting from ten thousands'
place and proceeding to the left.

If there are six digits, the sixth
product, is placed below the fifth
product starting from hundred
thousands' place (one lakh's place)
and proceeding to the left.

Like this, this process can be extended.

Great Deals on School & Homeschool Curriculum Books

Easy Multiplication
using Vedic Math

The following Links take you to
Easy Multiplication using Vedic Math.

Multiplying Two Digit Numbers
easily using Vedic math

Multiplying Three Digit Numbers
easily using Vedic math

Multiplying Four Digit Numbers
easily using Vedic math

Learning/Teaching Math Can Be Fun : Multiplication Help

Here is a collection of kids math
games and fun math activities for
the class room or for the home, to
make math exciting and easy to learn.

They help you

* To save you time and money to be
spent on resources, games and books.

* To become a wonderful, fun teacher
or parent who knows how to make math
fun, interesting and effective.

* To cater for all different ability
levels and cater for different
learning styles.

* To see your kids math skills soar
and their grades in math going
up and up.

This Collection of Fun Math Games
are electronic books (e-books)
that are downloaded to your computer
in a flash. You can start printing
games right away. You get to print
only what you want and as many
copies as you need.

For more information or to have
some FREE samples or to order
click HERE.

Exercise on Multiplication Help

Solve the following problems on Multiplication Help

Find the following

  1. 957 x 864
  2. 1423 x 4050
  3. 142 x 231
  4. 8601 x 3052
  5. 3678 x 123
  6. 10203 x 301
  7. 10021 x 1011
  8. 17200 x 36200

For Answers see at the end of the page.

Progressive Learning of Math : Multiplication help

Recently, I have found a series of math curricula
(Both Hard Copy and Digital Copy) developed by a Lady Teacher
who taught everyone from Pre-K students to doctoral students
and who is a Ph.D. in Mathematics Education.

This series is very different and advantageous
over many of the traditional books available.
These give students tools that other books do not.
Other books just give practice.
These teach students “tricks” and new ways to think.

These build a student’s new knowledge of concepts
from their existing knowledge.
These provide many pages of practice that gradually
increases in difficulty and provide constant review.

These also provide teachers and parents with lessons
on how to work with the child on the concepts.

The series is low to reasonably priced and include

Elementary Math curriculum

and

Algebra Curriculum.


Answers to Exercise on Multiplication Help

Answers to problems on Multiplication Help :

  1. 826848
  2. 5763150
  3. 32802
  4. 26250252
  5. 452394
  6. 3071103
  7. 10131231
  8. 622640000