TWO DIGIT MULTIPLICATION - LEARNING MADE EASY, EXAMPLES, EXERCISE

Your Ad Here





Learn/Teach
Multiplication through Fun Games
before Two Digit Multiplication

For details, see near
the bottom of this page.

Please study
Single Digit Multiplication,
if you have not already done so.

There, we explained multiplication
of a Multi-digit number by
a single digit number.

That knowledge is a prerequisite here.

Here, we deal with multiplication
by Two-Digit numbers.

Multiplication by a
two digit number

Here we do the multiplication by
single digit number in ones' place.

Then we do the multiplication by
single digit number in tens' place.

We write the second product
below the first product
starting from tens' place
and proceeding to the left.

The process will be clear
from the following examples
of Two Digit Multiplication.





Example 1 of
Two Digit Multiplication

Perform the Two Digit
Multiplication 97 x 86.

Solution :

          97
          86
        ----           4
          582        5
         776
        ----
        8342
        ----

First we multiply 97 with 6.

7 x 6 gives 42. We write 2 in
units' place, and 4 at a distance.

9 x 6 gives 54. We add 4 to this 54
to get 58. 4 is striked off. 58 is
placed to the left of 2 to get 582.

Thus, 97 x 6 is done, as explained in
Single Digit Multiplication.
This gave 582.

Then we multiply 97 with 8.

7 x 8 gives 56. We write 6 in
tens' place. and 5 at a distance.

9 x 8 gives 72. We add 5 to this 72
to get 77. 5 is striked off. 77 is
placed to the left of 6 to get 776.

Thus 97 x 8 gave 776.

Note that 776 is written
below 582 with 6 at tens'
place and then to the left.

These 582 and 776 placed
properly, are added.

While adding, 2 is descended
in the units' place.

8 and 6 added in tens' place to get
14. We write 4 in tens' place and
carry over 1 to the hundreds' place.

We add 5 and 7 and the carried over
1 in hundreds' place to get 13.
We write 3 in hundreds' place and
carry over 1 to thousands' place.

7 and carried over 1 in thousands'
place added gives 8 and this 8
is placed in thousands' place.

Thus 97 x 86 = 8342.

Get The Best Grades With the Least Amount of Effort

Here is a collection of proven tips,
tools and techniques to turn you into
a super-achiever - even if you've never
thought of yourself as a "gifted" student.

The secrets will help you absorb, digest
and remember large chunks of information
quickly and easily so you get the best grades
with the least amount of effort.

If you apply what you read from the above
collection, you can achieve best grades without
giving up your fun, such as TV, surfing the net,
playing video games or going out with friends!

Know more about the Speed Study System.

Example 2 of
Two Digit Multiplication

Find 234 x 57

Solution to Example 2 of Two Digit Multiplication:

          234
           57
        ----           2  2
         1638        2  1
        1170
        ----
        13338
        ----

First we multiply 234 with 7.

4 x 7 gives 28. We write 8 in
units' place. and 2 at a distance.

3 x 7 gives 21. We add 2 to this
21 to get 23. 2 at a distance
is striked off. We write 3 in
tens' place and 2 at a distance.

2 x 7 gives 14. We add 2 to this
14 to get 16. 2 at a distance is
striked off. 16 is placed to the
left of 38 to get 1638.

Thus, 234 x 7 is done,
as explained in
Single Digit Multiplication.
This gave 1638.

Then we multiply 234 with 5.

4 x 5 gives 20. We write 0 in
tens' place. and 2 at a distance.

3 x 5 gives 15. We add 2 to
this 15 to get 17. 2 is striked
off. We write 7 in hundreds'
place and 1 at a distance.

2 x 5 gives 10. We add 1 to
this 10 to get 11. 1 is striked
off. 11 is placed to the left
of 70 to get 1170.

Thus 234 x 5 gave 1170.

Note that 1170 is written
below 1638 with 0 at tens'
place and then to the left.

These 1638 and 1170 placed
properly, are added.

While adding, 8 is descended
in the units' place.

3 and 0 added in tens' place to
get 3. we write 3 in tens' place.

We add 6 and 7 to get 13. We
write 3 in hundreds' place and
carry over 1 to thousands' place.

1 and 1 and carried over 1 in
thousands' place added gives 3 and
this 3 is placed in thousands' place.

1 is descended in ten thousands place.

Thus 234 x 57 = 13338.

Great Deals on School & Homeschool Curriculum Books

Example 3 of
Two Digit Multiplication

Find 9182 x 43

Solution to Example 3 of Two Digit Multiplication:

          9182
            43
        ------           2  
         27546        3  
        36728
        ------
        394826
        ------

First we multiply 9182 with 3.

Here, 2 x 3 gives 6.
We write 6 in units' place.

Next, 8 x 3 gives 24.
We write 4 in tens'
place and 2 at a distance.

Then, 1 x 3 gives 3. We
add 2 to this 3 to get 5.
Then 2 is striked off.
We write 5 in hundreds' place.

Then, 9 x 3 gives 27.
We write 27 to the left
of 546 already present.

Thus 9182 x 3 = 27546.

Then we multiply 9182 with 4.

Here, 2 x 4 gives 8.
We write 8 in tens' place.

Next, 8 x 4 gives 32.
We write 2 in hundreds'
place and 3 at a distance.

Then, 1 x 4 gives 4. We add
3 to this 4 to get 7. Then
3 is striked off. We write
7 in thousands' place.

Then, 9 x 4 gives 36. We
write 36 to the left
of 728 already present.

Thus 9182 x 4 gave 36728.

Note that 36728 is written
below 27546 with 8 at tens'
place and then to the left.

These 27546 and 36728
placed properly, are added.

While adding, 6 is descended
in the units' place.

4 and 8 added in tens' place to
get 12. We write 2 in tens' place
and carry over 1 to hundreds' place.

We add 5 and 2 in hundreds' place
and carried over 1 to get 8.
We write 8 in hundreds' place.

7 and 7 added in thousands'
place to get 14. We write 4 in
thousands' place and carry over
1 to ten thousands' place.

We add 2 and 6 in ten thousands
place and carried over 1 to get 9.
We write 9 in ten thousands place.

3 is descended in hundred thousands'
(one lakh's) place.

Thus 9182 x 43 = 394826.

Great deals on School & Homeschool Curriculum Books and Software

Research-based personalized
Math Help tutoring program :
Two Digit Multiplication

Here is a resource for Solid Foundation in
Math Fundamentals from Middle thru High School.
You can check your self by the

FREE TRIAL.

Are you spending lot of money for math tutors to your
child and still not satisfied with his/her grades ?

Do you feel that more time from the tutor and
more personalized Math Help to identify and fix
the problems faced by your child will help ?

Here is a fool proof solution I strongly recommend
and that too With a minuscule fraction of the amount
you spent on tutors with unconditional 100% money
back Guarantee, if you are not satisfied.

SUBSCRIBE, TEST, IF NOT SATISFIED, RETURN FOR FULL REFUND

It is like having an unlimited time from an excellent Tutor.

It is an Internet-based math tutoring software program
that identifies exactly where your child needs help and
then creates a personal instruction plan tailored to your
child’s specific needs.

If your child can use a computer and access
the Internet, he or she can use the program.
And your child can access the program anytime
from any computer with Internet access.

Unique program to help improve math skills quickly and painlessly.

There is an exclusive, Parent Information Page provides YOU
with detailed reports of your child’s progress so you can
monitor your child’s success and give them encouragement.
These Reports include

  • Time spent using the program
  • Assessment results
  • Personalized remediation curriculum designed for your child
  • Details the areas of weakness where your child needs additional help
  • Provides the REASONS WHY your child missed a concept
  • List of modules accessed and amount of time spent in each module
  • Quiz results
  • Creates reports that can be printed and used to discuss issues with your child’s teachers
These reports are created and stored in a secure section
of the program, available exclusively to you, the parent.
The section is accessed by a password that YOU create and use.
No unauthorized users can access this information.

Personalized remediation curriculum designed for your child

Thus The features of this excellent Tutoring program are

  • Using detailed testing techniques
  • Identifing exactly where a student needs help.
  • Its unique, smart system pinpointing precise problem areas -
  • slowly and methodically guiding the student
  • raising to the necessary levels to fix the problem.

Not a “one-size-fits-all” approach!

Its research-based results have proven that
it really works for all students! in improving
math skills and a TWO LETTER GRADE INCREASE in
math test scores!,if they invest time in using
the program.

Proven for More than 10,000 U.S. public school
students who increased their math scores.

Proven methodology!



Other Topics Of Multiplication

The following links take you
to other topics of multiplication.

Multiplying Two Digit Numbers
easily using Vedic math

multiplying by Three
or more digit numbers,

Multiplying Three Digit Numbers
easily using Vedic math

Multiplying Four Digit Numbers
easily using Vedic math

Learning/Teaching Math Can Be Fun : Two Digit Multiplication

Here is a collection of kids math
games and fun math activities for
the class room or for the home, to
make math exciting and easy to learn.

They help you

* To save you time and money to be
spent on resources, games and books.

* To become a wonderful, fun teacher
or parent who knows how to make math
fun, interesting and effective.

* To cater for all different ability
levels and cater for different
learning styles.

* To see your kids math skills soar
and their grades in math going
up and up.

This Collection of Fun Math Games
are electronic books (e-books)
that are downloaded to your computer
in a flash. You can start printing
games right away. You get to print
only what you want and as many
copies as you need.

For more information or to have
some FREE samples or to order
click HERE.

Exercise on
Two Digit Multiplication

Solve the following problems on Two Digit Multiplication.

Do the following Two Digit Multiplications

  1. 34 x 26
  2. 78 x 17
  3. 459 x 34
  4. 691 x 29
  5. 1247 x 48
  6. 9673 x 54
  7. 1234 x 96
  8. 3759 x 52
  9. 4829 x 28
  10. 8302 x 71

For Answers see at the end of the page.

Progressive Learning of Math : Two Digit Multiplication

Recently, I have found a series of math curricula
(Both Hard Copy and Digital Copy) developed by a Lady Teacher
who taught everyone from Pre-K students to doctoral students
and who is a Ph.D. in Mathematics Education.

This series is very different and advantageous
over many of the traditional books available.
These give students tools that other books do not.
Other books just give practice.
These teach students “tricks” and new ways to think.

These build a student’s new knowledge of concepts
from their existing knowledge.
These provide many pages of practice that gradually
increases in difficulty and provide constant review.

These also provide teachers and parents with lessons
on how to work with the child on the concepts.

The series is low to reasonably priced and include

Elementary Math curriculum

and

Algebra Curriculum.


Answers to Exercise on
Two Digit Multiplication

Answers to problems on Two Digit Multiplication :

  1. 884
  2. 1326
  3. 15606
  4. 20039
  5. 59856
  6. 522342
  7. 118464
  8. 195468
  9. 135212
  10. 589442